Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Crocker William, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Davis John Frank Law Offices Of, Frank Davis John Law Offices, against Brand Scaffold Services Inc., Does 1 To 10, Doest 1 To 10, Salcedo Jose, represented by Mcnamara Ney Beatty Slattery Borges, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance Courthouse with William G. Willett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam G. Willett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management147 days |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2012 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Pi/Pd/Wd (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseTorrance Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time526 days |
Statement-Case Management
Date: 2012-06-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2012-02-01T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2012-02-01T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2012-06-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2012-03-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2012-06-06T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2012-02-01T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2012-02-01T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2012-06-06T00:00:00Affidavit of Prejudice - Premptory
Date: 2012-02-01T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2012-02-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2012-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2012-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2012-02-06T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed
Date: 2012-03-15T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed
Date: 2012-06-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2012-06-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2012-06-25T00:00:00Stipulation (TO CONTINUE TRIAL )
Date: 2013-02-13T00:00:00Jury Instructions (PRELIMINARY PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS )
Date: 2013-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2013-03-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#4 )
Date: 2013-03-28T00:00:00Response (TO MTN IN LIMINE #2 )
Date: 2013-04-03T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2013-04-12T00:00:00Opposition (TO MTN IN LIMINE #6 )
Date: 2013-03-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#3 )
Date: 2013-03-29T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2013-02-20T00:00:00Response (TO MTN IN LIMINE #1 )
Date: 2013-04-03T00:00:00Response (TO MTN IN LIMINE #8 )
Date: 2013-03-26T00:00:00Proof of Services by Mail (NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT )
Date: 2013-03-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2013-04-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2013-03-22T00:00:00Response (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO 8 )
Date: 2013-03-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2012-08-13T00:00:00Opposition (TO MTN IN LIMINE #5 )
Date: 2013-03-27T00:00:00Response (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO 7 )
Date: 2013-03-26T00:00:00Order (CONTINUING TRIAL )
Date: 2013-02-13T00:00:00Notice (OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES )
Date: 2012-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord
Date: 2013-03-18T00:00:00Response (TO MTN IN LIMINE #3 )
Date: 2013-04-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (witness list )
Date: 2013-04-11T00:00:00Opposition (TO MTN IN LIMINE #9 )
Date: 2013-04-03T00:00:00List of Witnesses
Date: 2013-04-12T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2013-04-12T00:00:00Statement of Case (JOINTLY )
Date: 2013-04-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER )
Date: 2013-04-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2013-04-16T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2013-04-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2013-04-23T00:00:00Order
Date: 2013-04-23T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: April 24, 2013Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S
Date: August 14, 2013Order (PI TRANSFER ORDER (SENT TO DEPT. 11, TORRANCE) )
Date: 2013-04-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2013-04-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (ELECTION NOT TO FILE AFFIDAVIT (CCP 170.6) )
Date: 2013-04-23T00:00:00Stipulation (REGARDING WILLIAM CROCKER'S WAGE LOSS )
Date: April 24, 2013Stipulation and Order
Date: April 24, 2013Request for Dismissal
Date: July 11, 2013Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S
Date: August 14, 2013Stipulation and Order (TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER )
Date: 2013-04-24T00:00:00Stipulation (REGARDING EMPLOYMENT, COURSE AND SCOPE )
Date: 2013-04-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2013-04-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.