Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Us Bank, filed a(n) Civil: Limited-Tahoe case against Daniel Stenback, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
CategoryCivil: Limited-Tahoe |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Dismissal Full Without Prejudice | |
May 28, 2010 | Not Heard: Dismissed | ||
April 16, 2010 | Continued: Court (412110) | ||
February 16, 2010 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
January 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Order | |
December 18, 2009 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
October 09, 2009 | Heard: Trial Date Set | ||
August 28, 2009 | Heard: Continued (432110) | ||
July 24, 2009 | Not Heard: Vacated (413210) | ||
May 22, 2009 | Heard: Continued (432110) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.