Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Iver Capital Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Coastal Law Firm Aplc, against Jesus Fred Bobadilla Sanchez, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Maria E. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaria E. Wood Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 16, 2019 |
CategoryCollection Crc 3.740-Over $10K/Under $25K |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions373 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Judgment on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of IVER CAPITAL CORPORATION
Date: December 02, 2021Notice of Document Return.
Date: November 02, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: June 21, 2021Declaration of Shay Hashemian in Support of Default Judgment CCP585(b)
Date: June 21, 2021Notice of Document Return.
Date: August 02, 2021Declaration of in Support of Default Judgment
Date: June 21, 2021Declaration of Re: Notice of Intent to Commence Legal Action
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Declaration of RE: Attorney's Fees
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Declaration of Re: Interest in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order: Default Judgment Review (Debt Buyer) – Non-Appearance
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Declaration of Shay Hashemian in Support of Default Judgment CCP 585(b)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of As to does 1-10, Inclusive
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Declaration Re: Interest in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of IVER CAPITAL CORPORATION
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Declaration Re: Attorney's Fees
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Declaration Re: Notice of Intent to Commence Legal Action
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Department Relocation and Assignment to Department S102 for all purposes.
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Over $10K/Under $25K CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92530.
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Amended Declaration of Non Service of Summons on Jesus filed by IVER CAPITAL CORPORATION
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of IVER CAPITAL CORPORATION and filed.
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.