Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jefferson Capital System Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Law Offices Of Harris & Zide, against Nicole L Cal, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 16, 2019 |
CategoryCollection Crc 3.740-Under $10,000 (Southwest)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions321 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2021 | HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 (SOUTHWEST) | ||
October 15, 2020 |
HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 (SOUTHWEST) Continued Not Heard |
||
October 15, 2020 | Hearing | HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 (SOUTHWEST) | |
October 09, 2020 |
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND COURT JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - SOUTHWEST) FILED 10/16/2019 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEM LLC AS TO NICOLE L CAL FILED. Not Applicable |
||
September 29, 2020 |
NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 10/15/20 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT S102. Not Applicable |
||
September 01, 2020 |
DEFAULT MAY BE ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - SOUTHWEST) FILED 10/16/2019 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEM LLC AS TO NICOLE L CAL ON OR AFTER 10/05/20. Not Applicable |
||
September 01, 2020 |
NOTICE TO DEFENDANT RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - SOUTHWEST) FILED 10/16/2019 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEM LLC AS TO NICOLE L CAL FILED; DATE OF MAILING 08/28/20. Not Applicable |
||
August 24, 2020 |
RETURNED DOCUMENT: DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET RECEIVED ON 08/20/20 SUBMITTED BY JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEM LLC. Not Applicable |
||
June 09, 2020 |
RETURNED DOCUMENT: DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE RECEIVED ON 06/09/20 SUBMITTED BY JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEM LLC. Not Applicable |
||
February 27, 2020 |
HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS RESCHEDULED TO 10/15/20 AT 08:00IN DEPARTMENT S102. Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.