Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The Best Service Co. Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Law Offices Of Christopher Stapleton, against Patricia A Quimilman, Robert A Quimilman, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 15, 2019 |
CategoryCollection Crc 3.740-Over $10K/Under $25K (Sw)&Nbsp; |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2021 | HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 (SOUTHWEST) | ||
October 21, 2020 |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING. Not Applicable |
||
October 20, 2020 |
RETURNED DOCUMENT: COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET RECEIVED ON 10/15/20 SUBMITTED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO. INC. Not Applicable |
||
October 15, 2020 |
HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 (SOUTHWEST) Continued Not Heard |
||
October 15, 2020 | Hearing | HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 (SOUTHWEST) | |
September 29, 2020 |
NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 10/15/20 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT S102. Not Applicable |
||
February 27, 2020 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 10/15/20 AT 8:00 IN DEPARTMENT S101 - RESCHEDULED TO:. Not Applicable |
||
February 27, 2020 |
HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS RESCHEDULED TO 10/15/20 AT 08:00IN DEPARTMENT S102. Not Applicable |
||
February 27, 2020 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 10/15/20 AT 8:00 IN DEPARTMENT S102. Not Applicable |
||
February 27, 2020 | NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT RELOCATION AND ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT S102 FOR ALL PURPOSES. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.