Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Us Bank Trust Na, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Naiman Law Group, Pc, against Susan E Hammatt, Christopher S Hammatt, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Albert J. Wojcik presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlbert J. Wojcik Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 22, 2017 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer (Residential) Under $10K (Sw)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions81 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time329 days |
CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00DECLARATION OF SUSAN ELIZABETH HAMMATT FILED
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00COPY(S) MADE
Date: 2017-06-15T00:00:00REQUEST FOR CONSOLIDATION WITH RIVERSIDE CASE NO MCC1700400
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00FEE WAIVER FOR CHRISTOPHER S HAMMATT WAS GRANTED FOR FIRST PAPER FEES; $255.00 WAIVED.
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY SUSAN HAMMATT AND CHRISTOPHER HAMMATT
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92562.
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED ATERIAL FACTS
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00DECLARATION OF CHRISOTPHER HAMMATT FILED
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00EX PARTE HEARING SET 8/25/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. S205 (SOUTHWEST).
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00DECLARATION OF SHERYL CUEVAS SUPPORT OF MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00DECLARATION OF RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FILED
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FOR A REQUEST TO CONTINUE BY CHRISTOPHER S HAMMATT, SUSAN E HAMMATT FILED
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY SUSAN E HAMMATT (FORM FW-001).
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00ORDER FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRA AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK.
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY US BANK TRUST NA.
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION RE: STAY EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT (SOUTHWEST) FILED.
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00FEE WAIVER FOR SUSAN E HAMMATT WAS GRANTED FOR FIRST PAPER FEES; $255.00 WAIVED.
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY CHRISTOPHER S HAMMATT (FORM FW-001).
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY US BANK TRUST NA.
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00DECLARATION OF DANIEL VASQUEZ SUPPORT SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY CHRISTOPHER S HAMMATT, SUSAN E HAMMATT FILED
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 7/21/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00STATMENT OF FACTS & MEMO POINTS & AUTH SUPP SJ
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00DECLARATION OF RANDALL D NAIMAN IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/22/2017 OF US BANK TRUST NA AND FILED.
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00APPELLATE COURT CASE NUMBER: APP1700170.
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00ORDER FOR MOTION TO STAY EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT IS DEN AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK.
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00NOTICE OF APPEAL FEE POSTED BY US BANK TRUST NA
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00NOTICE TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT FILED
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY EXECUTION FILED
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00NOTIFICATION OF FILING APPELLATE CASE FILED
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF FAILURE FILE APPELLANT BRIEF FILED
Date: December 28, 2017REFUND CHECK MAILED TO CLERK OF THE COURT DOC#1908698191, IN THE AMOUNT OF $83.50.
Date: November 27, 2017ORDER PETITION FOR WRIT & STAY DENIED FILED
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00EX PARTE HEARING SET ON 9/01/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPARTMENT S205
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE MOTION BY US BANK TRUST NA FILED
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00ORDER APPEAL IS DISMISSED FILED
Date: March 13, 2018UPS RECORD SENT TO APPELLANT MARKED AS UNDELIVERABLE RECEIVER MOVED
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00TRUST EXONERATION - APPEAL
Date: November 27, 2017NOTICE OF FILING RECORD & BRIEF SCHEDULE FILED
Date: November 21, 2017REGISTER OF ACTIONS IMAGED (APPEALS)
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00TRUST DEPOSIT ON APPEAL
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00APPELLATE RECORD CERTIFIED
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00NOTIFICATION OF ESTIMATE OF COSTS FILED
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00ORDER AUGMENTATION ATTACHEMENT GRANTED FILED
Date: January 18, 2018APPELLANTS NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD FILED
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION BY US BANK TRUST NA FILED.
Date: April 11, 2018DECLARATION OF /REGARDING NOTICE OF EX PARTE ON 09/01/17 FILED
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE APPEAL DES & WRIT FILED
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00DECLARATION OF /REGARDING NOTICE OF EX PARTE ON RANDAL NAIMAN LAW FOR HEARING ON 08/23/17 FILED
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF FAILURE FILE APLT OPENING BRIEF FILED
Date: February 21, 2018EX PARTE HEARING SET ON 9/01/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT S205
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED
Date: 2017-08-28T00:00:00ORDER PETITION FOR WRIT & STAY DENIED FILED
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.