Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bassett, Lela Aline filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Humphreys, Elizabeth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHumphreys, Elizabeth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2014 |
CategoryProbate Estates |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
DE172 CREDITORS CLAIM FILED RECORD SEALED Creditor's Claim filed by State Of California Franchise Tax Board. Creditor's Claim DE-172 Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
DE154 REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE FILED RECORD SEALED Request for Special Notice filed by State Of California Franchise Tax Board. Request for Special Notice DE-154/GC-035 Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: Account and Report held on July 24, 2017.
Judge: Lee, Jayne |
|
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
MINUTEORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for Account and Report held on 07/24/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Lee, Jayne |
|
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
CONTINUANCE: Attorney Phillip Cunningham requesting continuance of 7/24/17 hearing to next available
Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
TENTATIVERULING PROBATENOTE RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
July 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
DE120 NOTICE OF HEARING DECEDENTS ESTATE OR TRUST PROBATE DECEDENTS ESTATES FILED RECORD SEALED Notice of Hearing - Decedent's Estate or Trust filed by Woodward, Rodney; Woodward, Paige. Notice of Hearing - Decedent's Estate or Trust DE-120 Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
July 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
TENTATIVERULING PROBATENOTE RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Account and Report , set for 07/24/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Lesley D. Holland in Department 31.
Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Attorney, phillip m Cunningham, retained for Rodney Woodward .
Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.