Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lacativo, Neal A. filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Humphreys, Elizabeth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHumphreys, Elizabeth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2011 |
CategoryProbate Estates |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time1463 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to 31 effective 04/01/2015.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Offsite,Records Management
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Petition on Waiver of Accounting associated on 02/03/2012.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Volume updated.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Petition on Waiver of Accounting has been Granted.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 02/03/2012 08:30:00 AM.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case closed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Settling Final Account and Report, Fees and Final Distribution filed by Porter, Shae Anne on 02/03/2012.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Matter heard.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Staff,Almendarez, Cecilia to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.