Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kantun, Justino, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case against Safeway, Inc., An Unknown Business Entity, General Teamsters Local Union Number 439, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Kronlund, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKronlund, Barbara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 13, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Wrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Safeway, Inc., an unknown business entity. Case Management Statement Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
POS050 PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE FILED RECORD SEALED Proof of Electronic Service filed by Safeway, Inc., an unknown business entity. Proof of Service Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Kantun, Justino. Case Management Statement Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Result: Vacated
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Kantun, Justino. Request for Dismissal Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
CIV110 REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED RECORD SEALED Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to General Teamsters Local Union Number 439. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING FILED RECORD SEALED Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Dismissal as to deft General Teamsters, set for 07/09/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court's OSC Re: Dismissal scheduled on 06/25/2021 at 8:45 AM has been Continued.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTEORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for Court's OSC Re: Dismissal held on 06/25/2021 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING FILED RECORD SEALED Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference, set for 08/06/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.