Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Miscellaneous Participant,, Foster Advantage, Inc., Khounvichith Wright, Sandy S, Esveegee Enterprise, Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Wright, Gregory A, Khounvichith, Sandy S, Greg Wright Construction Inc., Esveegee Enterprise, Llc, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Lofthus, Linda L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLofthus, Linda L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 24, 2011 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Other Real Property |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions482 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time2832 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: Lofthus, Linda L. |
|
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing Result: Vacated
Judge: Lofthus, Linda L. |
|
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
CIV120 NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED RECORD SEALED Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Foster Advantage, Inc.. Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Judge: Lofthus, Linda L. |
|
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to dismissed.
Judge: Lofthus, Linda L. |
|
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
CIV110 REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED RECORD SEALED Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice - Entire Action as to Foster Advantage, Inc., Gregory A Wright, Sandy S Khounvichith, Greg Wright Construction Inc., Esveegee Enterprise, Llc Entered. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L. |
|
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Foster Advantage, Inc.. Request for Dismissal Judge: Lofthus, Linda L. |
|
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED RECORD SEALED Notice of Trial filed by Foster Advantage, Inc.. Notice - (Other) Judge: Lofthus, Linda L. |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED RECORD SEALED Defendants' Demand for Jury Trial filed by Wright, Gregory A. Demand for Jury Trial Judge: Lofthus, Linda L. |
|
March 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FILED RECORD SEALED Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal of Demand for Jury Trial filed by Foster Advantage, Inc.. Notice - (Other) Judge: Lofthus, Linda L. |
|
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: Trial Setting Conference held on March 25, 2016.
Judge: Holly, Carter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.