Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Rbs Citizens, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Salazar, Karen, Salazar, Gil, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Kronlund, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKronlund, Barbara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2014 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Other Collections |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Payment received in the amount of $26.00, receipt number 228316.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Current address information for Lawrence Dreyfuss updated.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Payment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 09/22/2015, transaction number 1563907 and receipt number 413644.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Address for Lawrence Dreyfuss selected.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ issued.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest updated 09/22/2015.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Costs acknowledged/updated. Judgment total updated to 58774.38.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address and/or Telephone filed by Dreyfuss, Lawrence J. on 09/16/2015.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Postjudgment interest accrued 8356.74.
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.