Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Roots, Verniqua Deprise, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Mitchell-Pullum, Christy, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Guy Castillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGuy Castillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 04, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil - Civil Harassment |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time181 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Disposed.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing Result: Vacated
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: OSC Re: Harassment , set for 10/24/2019 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 3A.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Denied and filed on 10/07/2019.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Verniqua Deprise Roots.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Roots, Verniqua Deprise. Civil Case Cover Sheet Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment) filed by Roots, Verniqua Deprise. Request for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment) Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case initiated.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.