Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Richard W Paul As Co Trustee Of The William L And Theresa T Paul Irrevocable Trust B And Trust C Established By The William L Paul And Theresa T Paul Family Trust Agreement Dated June 8 1982, Paul, Richard W, Jan Bernstein As Co Trustee Of The William L And Theresa T Paul Irrevocable Trust B And Trust C Established By The William L Paul And Theresa T Paul Family Trust Agreement Dated June 8 1982, Bernstein, Jan, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil Complaint - Other case against William L Paul As Former Trustee Of The William L And Theresa T Paul Irrevocable Trust B And Trust C Established By The William L Paul And Theresa T Paul Family Trust Agreement Dated June 8 1982, Paul, William L, Paul, Anita, Miscellaneous Participant,, Kamofel, Cindy, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Lofthus, Linda L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLofthus, Linda L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 26, 2012 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Complaint - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions174 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time2525 days |
Richard W Paul As Co Trustee Of The William L And Theresa T Paul Irrevocable Trust B And Trust C Established By The William L Paul And Theresa T Paul Family Trust Agreement Dated June 8 1982
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: Lofthus, Linda L. |
|
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Payment received for 44A - Copy of any record (per side) in the amount of 54.00 on 09/29/2015, transaction number 1569110 and receipt number 414396.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition 24 months met timely.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition 18 months met timely.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition 12 months met timely.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Status of Richard W Paul as Co Trustee of the William L and Theresa T Paul Irrevocable Trust B and Trust C established by The William L Paul and Theresa T Paul Family Trust Agreement dated June 8 1982 updated to Dismissed with Prejudice.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Status of Jan Bernstein updated to Dismissed with Prejudice.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Status of Jan Bernstein as Co Trustee of the William L and Theresa T Paul Irrevocable Trust B and Trust C established by the William L Paul and Theresa T Paul Family Trust Agreement dated June 8 1982 updated to Dismissed with Prejudice.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Status of Richard Paul updated to Dismissed with Prejudice.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Status of William L Paul as former Trustee of the William L and Theresa T Paul Irrevocable Trust B and Trust C established by the William L Paul and Theresa T Paul Family Trust Agreement dated June 8 1982 updated to Dismissed with Prejudice.
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.