Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Tan, Jianfu, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Henry, Otis, Zhu, Xiu Ming, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Abdallah, George J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAbdallah, George J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 01, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Proof of Service by Mail - Civil filed by Tan, Jianfu.
Date: May 26, 2022Demand for Jury Trial filed by Zhu, Xiu Ming.
Date: July 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | The court having read and considered Defendant Otis Henry's Motion for Summary Judgment or In the Alternative Summary Adjudication and supporting documents including a request for Judicial Notice file... | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 07/25/2022 08:45 AM . MINUTE_ORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
MINUTE_ORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 07/25/2022 08:45 AM . Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Payment received by Xiu Zhu in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 755973.
Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by First-Class Mail - Civil filed by Tan, Jianfu. POS030 PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS MAIL CIVIL FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
POS030 PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS MAIL CIVIL FILED RECORD SEALED Proof of Service by First-Class Mail - Civil filed by Tan, Jianfu. Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement filed by Tan, Jianfu. CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Tan, Jianfu. Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement filed by Henry, Otis. CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Henry, Otis. Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.