Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Garcia, Julissa, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Fca Us Llc, A Delaware Limited Liability Company, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Ross, Roger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoss, Roger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time400 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Disposed.
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
CIV110 REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED RECORD SEALED Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Julissa Garcia, FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing Result: Vacated
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
CIV110 REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED RECORD SEALED Request for Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Garcia, Julissa. Request for Dismissal Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER FILED RECORD SEALED Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Determination of Attorney Fees and Costs Under Settlement Agreement filed by Julissa Garcia. Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FILED RECORD SEALED Notice of Submission of Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs Pursuant to CRC 3.1312(a) and (b) filed by Garcia, Julissa. Notice - (Other) Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE FILED RECORD SEALED Proof of Service filed by Garcia, Julissa. Proof of Service Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTEORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 01/16/2020 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: CMC: Request for Dismissal held on January 16, 2020.
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 03/05/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B.
Judge: Ross, Roger |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.