Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ally Financial Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Haddad, Anese Musa, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Kronlund, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKronlund, Barbara Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 05, 2012 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions62 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time2516 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Automatic Unlimited Case Disposition Clock expired.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Payment received for 141A - Abstract of judgment - Civil in the amount of 25.00 on 12/13/2012, transaction number 1094741 and receipt number 291435.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Abstract issued.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
December 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Ally Financial Inc. on 12/10/2012.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition 18 months met timely.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition 24 months met timely.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition 12 months met timely.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
December 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Complaint disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
December 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Judicial Officer,Kronlund, Barbara to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.