Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Perez, Shawn, Perez, Jennifer, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against T.C. Construction And Design, Inc., A California Corporation, Charondo, Antonio M., in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Ross, Roger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoss, Roger Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2012 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1880 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time2191 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
EJ100 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of FULL Judgment filed by Perez, Shawn; Perez, Jennifer. Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE FILED RECORD SEALED Proof of Service of Mailing by the Appeals Clerk filed by the Superior Court, County of San Joaquin. Proof of Service of Mailing by the Appeals Clerk Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
COURT OF APPEAL LETTER FILED RECORD SEALED Court of Appeal Letter filed by the Superior Court, County of San Joaquin. Court of Appeal Letter Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO MEDIATION COURT OF APPEAL FILED RECORD SEALED Court of Appeal Order to Mediation filed by the Superior Court, County of San Joaquin. Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
September 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED RECORD SEALED Notice of Entry of Order filed by Perez, Jennifer; Perez, Shawn. Notice of Entry of Order Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER DETERMINING PLAINTIFFS AS PREVAILING PARTY AND GRANTNG PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM OF COST OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TAX COSTS FILED RECORD SEALED Order Determining Plaintiffs as Prevailing Party and Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' memorandum of Costs or in the Alternative Tax Costs, filed by Shawn Perez, Jennifer Perez. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L. |
|
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
MINUTEORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for Motion held on 08/30/2016 09:00 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L. |
|
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: Motion held on August 30, 2016.
Judge: Lofthus, Linda L. |
|
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: Motion to Tax Costs held on August 30, 2016.
Judge: Lofthus, Linda L. |
|
August 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
TENTATIVERULING PROBATENOTE RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Ross, Roger |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.