Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Folsom Buick Pontiac Gmc. Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Gulley-Washington, Evelyn J, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with CONVERSION presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONVERSION Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 04, 2008 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time4069 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned (No activity over 180 days) filed by Folsom Buick Pontiac GMC. Inc on 01/31/2013.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ has been updated.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 5 to Offsite,Records Management
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Payment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 04/16/2010, transaction number 516016 and receipt number 122974.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ issued.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint (signed by Judge Holly. Total Judgment $8,910.37) associated on 04/08/2010.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Association created between Williams, G Michael and Folsom Buick Pontiac GMC. Inc.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Status of Folsom Buick Pontiac GMC. Inc updated to Disposed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Status of Evelyn Gulley-Washington updated to Inactive.
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.