Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tnt Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Bauer, Brooks, Bauer, Beverly, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Thomasson, Lauren presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomasson, Lauren Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 04, 2008 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions439 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time4069 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: Thomasson, Lauren |
|
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Civil Records to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 5
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Matter heard.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Automatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock stopped.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Judicial Officer,Thomasson, Lauren to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Civil Records
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Draft version of minutes printed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minutes finalized for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor (SHC) heard 09/04/2009 09:00:00 AM.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Draft version of minutes printed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Automatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock stopped.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Automatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock started.
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.