Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lopez Luna, Maria Guadalupe, Cota, Emeterio Valdez, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Doe, John, Acevedo, Daniel Aguilera, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Kronlund, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKronlund, Barbara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2022 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Auto Tort |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
POS010 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED RECORD SEALED Proof of Service of Summons as to Daniel Aguilera Acevedo served on 12/11/2022 by Personal Service. $135.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Lopez Luna, Maria Guadalupe; Cota, Emeterio Valdez. Case Management Statement Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 01/10/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTEORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 09/07/2021 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on September 7, 2021.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Lopez Luna, Maria Guadalupe; Cota, Emeterio Valdez. Case Management Statement Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 09/07/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on May 5, 2021.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTEORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 05/05/2021 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by Lopez Luna, Maria Guadalupe; Cota, Emeterio Valdez. Case Management Statement Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.