Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cosj-Ttc, Rrd, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Vargas, Felipe, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Holland, Lesley D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHolland, Lesley D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2019 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution issued as to Felipe Vargas on 10/31/2019 to Los Angeles County.
Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
MC012 MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED RECORD SEALED Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $25.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $128.24 filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Memorandum of Costs After Judgment. Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
MC012 MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED RECORD SEALED Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $25.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $26.82 filed by COSJ-TTC, RRD. Memorandum of Costs After Judgment. Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment Issued.
Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Disposed.
Judge: Villapudua, Xapuri |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
MINUTEORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 11/01/2018 11:00 AM . Judge: Villapudua, Xapuri |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: Court Trial held on November 1, 2018.
Judge: Villapudua, Xapuri |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT SMALL CLAIMS FILED RECORD SEALED Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Villapudua, Xapuri |
|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal 1320.40 cost 45.00, set for 11/01/2018 at 11:00 AM before Hon. Xapuri Villapudua in Department 9A.
Judge: Villapudua, Xapuri |
|
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE FILED RECORD SEALED Proof of Service (SC) as to Felipe Vargas served on 10/05/2018 by Certified Mail. . Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.