Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Burgess, Monty Alan, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Just Right Construction Inc., in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Holland, Lesley D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHolland, Lesley D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions104 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time168 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
DECISION FILED RECORD SEALED Decision After Court Trial filed. Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
MINUTEORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for Ruling on Submitted Matter held on 03/13/2018 02:15 PM . Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FILED RECORD SEALED Judgment for Just Right Construction Inc. against Monty Alan Burgess in the amount of . Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Lesley D. Holland Assigned.
Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: Trial De Novo held on March 12, 2018.
Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
MINUTEORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for Trial De Novo held on 03/12/2018 10:00 AM . Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
SC109 AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR FILED RECORD SEALED Authorization to Appear filed by Just Right Construction Inc.. Authorization to Appear Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Trial De Novo , set for 03/12/2018 at 10:00 AM before Hon. Lesley D. Holland in Department 11A.
Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING FILED RECORD SEALED Hearing regarding: Trial De Novo , set for 03/12/2018 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 6D. Judge: Mallett, Richard M. |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Appeal.
Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.