Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Human Services Agency, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Velasco, Pricilla, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Sparks, Sheryle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSparks, Sheryle Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2014 |
CategorySmall Claims |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions125 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time1662 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
|
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Abstract issued.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Post Judgment effective 04/26/2015
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
March 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition 95 days met late.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
March 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition 75 days met late.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case disposed with disposition of Judgment contested.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Small Claims to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Automatic Small Claims Disposition Clock stopped.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment for Human Services Agency against Velasco, Pricilla in the amount of: 490.00 principal, punitive damages, 92.50 costs, pre-judgment interest, and attorney fees entered on 03/11/2015.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) generated.
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.