Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Guzman, Christine, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Angel, Emily S, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Sparks, Sheryle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSparks, Sheryle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2013 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Civil Records to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Small Claims
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Court Trial (SC) - Principal 2,000.00, FW costs 50.00 scheduled for 08/03/2015 at 01:30:00 PM in 17 was vacated.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courtrooms,17,Other to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Civil Records
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Small Claims to Courtrooms,17,Other
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Scheduling auto case clock expired.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Small Claims
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Automatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock started.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant generated.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (RESET) filed by Guzman, Christine on 04/06/2015.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 08/03/2015 at 01:30:00 PM in 17 at Stockton.
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.