Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Connect By American Family, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Avalos, Alma, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Abdallah, George J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAbdallah, George J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 25, 2020 |
CategoryLimited Civil Uninsured Motorist |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Amended Complaint filed by Connect by American Family.
Date: December 01, 2021Minutes finalized for CMC: Judgment held on 04/19/2022 08:45 AM .
Date: April 19, 2022Summons issued and filed.
Date: November 25, 2020Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Connect by American Family.
Date: November 25, 2020Case Management Statement filed by Connect by American Family.
Date: May 19, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Connect by American Family.
Date: November 25, 2020Request for Default against Alma Avalos Entered
Date: August 22, 2022Declaration of Venue filed by Connect by American Family.
Date: November 25, 2020Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/19/2021 08:45 AM .
Date: October 19, 2021Request for Default against Alma Avalos Entered
Date: May 12, 2021Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.
Date: November 25, 2020Amended Complaint filed by Connect by American Family.
Date: December 01, 2021Case Management Statement filed by Connect by American Family.
Date: May 19, 2021Declaration of Venue filed by Connect by American Family.
Date: November 25, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Connect by American Family.
Date: November 25, 2020Summons issued and filed.
Date: November 25, 2020Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Connect by American Family.
Date: November 25, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Connect by American Family.
Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
CIV100 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT OR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Request for Default against Alma Avalos Entered Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
POS010 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED RECORD SEALED Proof of Service of Summons as to Alma Avalos served on 04/18/2022 by Personal Service. $96.50. Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Dismissal for failure to prosecute; CCP section 583.410, set for 10/18/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A.
Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: CMC: Judgment held on April 19, 2022.
Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
MINUTE_ORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for CMC: Judgment held on 04/19/2022 08:45 AM . Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED RECORD SEALED Amended Complaint filed by Connect by American Family. Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED RECORD SEALED Amended Complaint filed by Connect by American Family. Amended Complaint Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: CMC: Judgment , set for 04/19/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A.
Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on October 19, 2021.
Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.