Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Massei, Robert, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Duval, Vanita J., Alfred, James C., in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Sparks, Sheryle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSparks, Sheryle Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 03, 2011 |
CategoryLimited Civil Unlawful Detainer Residential |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions17 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time2792 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
|
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Unlawful Detainers to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ has been updated.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Returned (125.00) filed by Massei, Robert on 01/13/2012.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Judicial Officer,Sparks, Sheryle to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Unlawful Detainers
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Unlawful Detainers to Courthouse,Courthouse - Judicial Officer,Sparks, Sheryle
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Other (declaration in support of ex parte application for temporary stay of execution of judgment) filed by Duval, Vanita J. on 01/11/2012.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Opposition (Declaration to temporary stay opposition) filed by Massei, Robert on 01/11/2012.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application for Stay filed by Duval, Vanita J. on 01/11/2012.
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.