Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Stockton Townhouse Apartments, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Krebs, Robin, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Sparks, Sheryle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSparks, Sheryle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 04, 2008 |
CategoryLimited Civil Unlawful Detainer Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time4069 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE FILED RECORD SEALED Proof of service filed by Stockton Townhouse Apartments. Proof of Service Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
|
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Payment received by Stockton Townhouse Apartments in the amount of $30.00. Receipt number 211724.
Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
|
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
MC012 MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED RECORD SEALED Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $1697.69 filed by Stockton Townhouse Apartments. Memorandum of Costs After Judgment. Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
|
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
EJ190 APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Application for Renewal of Judgment filed by Stockton Townhouse Apartments. Application for Renewal of Judgment Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
|
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
EJ195 NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed by Stockton Townhouse Apartments. Notice of Renewal of Judgment Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
MC050 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY CIVIL WITHOUT COURT ORDER FILED RECORD SEALED Substitution of Attorney filed by Stockton Townhouse Apartments. Substitution of Attorney Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Attorney, Paul E Echols, retained for Stockton Townhouse Apartments .
Judge: **Sparks, Sheryle |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed as to[DEFT] Robin Krebs; by personally serving w/ S&C on 8/29/07 @ 6:59pm
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Court finding
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.