Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Murphy, Shannon O Sr, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Superior Court Of California, County Of Alameda, Office Of The Clerks, Miscellaneous Participant,, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Holland, Lesley D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHolland, Lesley D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 09, 2012 |
CategoryLimited Civil Pi/Pd/Wd (Other) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions80 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time3035 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER FILED RECORD SEALED Order on Application to Vacate Prefiling Order and Remove Plaintiff/Petitioner from Judicial Council Vexatious Litigant List signed by Judge Villapudua on 10/30/2020 filed by Shannon O Murphy Sr. Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO VACATE FILED RECORD SEALED Request/Application to Vacate Prefiling Order on Vexatious Litigant filed by Murphy, Shannon O Sr. Request/Application to Vacate Prefiling Order on Vexatious Litigant Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO FILING PARTY FILED RECORD SEALED Request/Application to Vacate Prefiling Order on Vexatious Litigant filed by Murphy, Shannon O Sr. Request/Application to Vacate Prefiling Order on Vexatious Litigant Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Payment received in the amount of $1.00, receipt number 375173.
Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Payment received in the amount of $2.00, receipt number 307263.
Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Payment received in the amount of $27.00, receipt number 296477.
Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
RULING FILED RECORD SEALED CLERK S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RECORD SEALED Ruling by Judge Lofthus filed. (Application Denied) Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO VACATE PREFILING ORDER AND REMOVE PLAINTIFF FROM JUDICIAL COUNCIL VEXATIOUS LITIGANT LIST FILED RECORD SEALED Application for order to Vacate Prefiling Order and remove Plaintiff from Judicial Council Vexatious Litigant List filed by Murphy, Shannon O Sr. Request/Application to Vacate Prefiling Order on Vexatious Litigant Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
RULING FILED RECORD SEALED CLERK S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RECORD SEALED Ruling signed by Judge Alva filed (Application Denied). Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.