Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Chand, Jason D, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with CONVERSION presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONVERSION Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 04, 2008 |
CategoryLimited Civil Other Collections |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions383 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time4069 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Snyder, David B added as a effective 08/07/2013.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Address for David Snyder selected.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney filed by Midland Funding LLC on 08/06/2013.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned (unsatisfied) filed by Midland Funding LLC on 09/06/2012.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ has been updated.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ issued.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Payment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 02/21/2012, transaction number 941583 and receipt number 251306.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
January 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Midland Funding LLC on 01/27/2012.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
January 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Postjudgment costs acknowledged 195.00.
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.