Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 case against Cabral, Maricela L, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Waters, Robert T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWaters, Robert T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 04, 2021 |
CategoryLimited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. Notice of Change of Address Judge: Waters, Robert T. |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to Civil Code 1788.60(a) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 1788.60 Judge: Waters, Robert T. |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Default against Maricela L Cabral Entered
Judge: Waters, Robert T. |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Counsel re: 1. Interest 2. Costs (CCP 1033) 3. Attorney Fees filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033 Judge: Waters, Robert T. |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Judge: Waters, Robert T. |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Robert T. Waters Assigned. BATCH
Judge: Waters, Robert T. |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
POS10 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED RECORD SEALED Proof of Service of Summons as to Maricela L Cabral served on 12/12/2020 by Personal Service. $65.00. Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
SUM100 SUMMONS CIVIL FILED RECORD SEALED Summons issued and filed. Summons - Civil Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICEOFCASEASSIGNMENT WITHOUTHEARING RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Payment received by LLC Portfolio Recovery Associates in the amount of $181.00. Receipt number 602108.
Judge: Ross, Roger |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.