Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Onemain Financial Group, Llc, filed a(n) Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 case against Ortiz, Guillermo H, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Abdallah, George J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAbdallah, George J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 20, 2020 |
CategoryLimited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by OneMain Financial Group, LLC.
Date: November 20, 2020Notice of Case Assignment.
Date: November 20, 2020Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by OneMain Financial Group, LLC.
Date: November 20, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Disposed.
Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
MINUTE_ORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 08/05/2022 08:45 AM . Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER FILED RECORD SEALED Entry of Court Ordered Dismissal as to OneMain Financial Group, LLC, Guillermo H Ortiz Entered. Without prejudice Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: CMC: Request for Dismissal held on August 5, 2022.
Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
CM110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Case Management Statement filed by OneMain Financial Group, LLC. Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING FILED RECORD SEALED Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 08/05/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A. Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Conditional Settlement.
Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
CM200 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED RECORD SEALED Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by OneMain Financial Group, LLC. Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE FILED RECORD SEALED Proof of Service of Summons as to Guillermo H Ortiz served on 12/03/2020 by Personal Service. $75.00. Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
SUM100 SUMMONS CIVIL FILED RECORD SEALED Summons issued and filed. Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.