Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc As Assignee Of Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 case against Taylor, Nicholas W, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Abdallah, George J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAbdallah, George J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 17, 2020 |
CategoryLimited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution issued as to Nicholas W Taylor on 09/15/2021 to Sacramento County.
Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Payment received by LLC Cavalry SPV I in the amount of $40.00. Receipt number 680362.
Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
MC012 MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED RECORD SEALED Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $41.13 filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A.. Memorandum of Costs After Judgment. Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Disposed.
Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
JUD100 JUDGMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Judgment for Cavalry SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A. against Nicholas W Taylor in the amount of 2011.30. Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED RECORD SEALED Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 1788.60 filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A.. Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 1788.60 Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
CIV105 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT OR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Request for Default against Nicholas W Taylor Entered Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION FILED RECORD SEALED Declaration Re: Original Documents and / or Lost Instrument filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A.. Declaration Re: Original Documents and / or Lost Instrument Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED RECORD SEALED Declaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest and Attorney Fees filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A.. Declaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION FILED RECORD SEALED Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033 filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A.. Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033 Judge: Abdallah, George J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.