Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Td Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 case against Lopez, Yuliana, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Ross, Roger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoss, Roger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 25, 2018 |
CategoryLimited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions807 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time807 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Disposed.
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
JUD100 JUDGMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Judgment for TD Bank USA, N.A. against Yuliana Lopez in the amount of 1026.64. Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
CIV100 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT OR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Request for Default against Yuliana Lopez Entered Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION FILED RECORD SEALED Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033 filed by TD Bank USA, N.A.. Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033 Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
CIV110 REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED RECORD SEALED Request for Dismissal Does filed by TD Bank USA, N.A.. Request for Dismissal Does Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default and Default Clerk's Judgment filed by TD Bank USA, N.A.. Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 585 FILED RECORD SEALED Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by TD Bank USA, N.A.. Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
POS010 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED RECORD SEALED Proof of Service of Summons as to Yuliana Lopez served on 08/29/2018 by Personal Service. $67.50. Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Attorney, Gregory J Cobb, retained for TD Bank USA, N.A. .
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
CM010 CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED RECORD SEALED Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by TD Bank USA, N.A.. Civil Case Cover Sheet Judge: Ross, Roger |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.