Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 case against Farley, Denise, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Ross, Roger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoss, Roger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2017 |
CategoryLimited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions93 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time100 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING FILED RECORD SEALED Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal Order on Settlement, set for 10/06/2022 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Conditional Settlement.
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER FILED RECORD SEALED Order on Settlement Agreement and Stipulation for Judgment filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Payment received by LLC Portfolio Recovery Associates in the amount of $201.00. Receipt number 270855.
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Settlement Agreement -First paper Limited Civil (case filed by assignee within small claims jurisdictional limit, with declaration) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. First paper Limited Civil (case filed by assignee within small claims jurisdictional limit, with declaration) Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
POS010 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED RECORD SEALED Proof of Service of Proof of Service as to Denise Farley served on 01/13/2018 by Personal Service. $59.50. Costs Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION RE REDUCED FILING FEE PURSUANT TO BP 6322 1 FILED RECORD SEALED Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1c1 filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1c1 Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUM100 SUMMONS CIVIL FILED RECORD SEALED Summons issued and filed. Summons - Civil Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Payment received by LLC Portfolio Recovery Associates in the amount of $181.00. Receipt number 244086.
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT BY ASSIGNEE WITHIN SMALL CLAIMS JURISDICTIONAL LIMIT FILED RECORD SEALED Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit Judge: Ross, Roger |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.