Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Traco Investment Corporation, filed a(n) Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 case against Snell, Sharon D, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Ross, Roger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoss, Roger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2017 |
CategoryLimited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions162 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time968 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Attorney, Benjamin Woo, retained for GD Acquisitions LLC .
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment filed by Traco Investment Corporation. Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution issued as to Sharon D Snell on 08/17/2018 to San Joaquin County.
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
MC012 MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED RECORD SEALED Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $75.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $107.25 filed by Traco Investment Corporation. Memorandum of Costs After Judgment. Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Payment received by Traco Investment Corporation in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 326120.
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Disposed.
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUD100 JUDGMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Judgment for Traco Investment Corporation against Sharon D Snell in the amount of 6030.48. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark |
|
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 585 FILED RECORD SEALED Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Traco Investment Corporation. Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF COUNSEL IN SUPPORT FILED RECORD SEALED Declaration in Support filed by Traco Investment Corporation. Declaration in Support Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION RE CCP 1033 FILED RECORD SEALED Declaration Pursuant to CCP. 1033 filed by Traco Investment Corporation. Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033 Judge: Ross, Roger |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.