Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Stanislaus Credit Control Service, Inc., A California Corporation, filed a(n) Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 case against Castro, Jose M, Castro, Amanda, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Kronlund, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKronlund, Barbara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2017 |
CategoryLimited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions132 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time953 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EJ130 WRIT OF EXECUTION FILED RECORD SEALED Writ of Execution as to Jose M Castro returned and filed. Status: Returned With Full Satisfaction. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution issued as to Jose M Castro and Amanda Castro on 10/26/2017 to San Joaquin County.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
MC012 MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED RECORD SEALED Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $28.11 filed by Stanislaus Credit Control Service, Inc., a California Corporation. Memorandum of Costs After Judgment. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Payment received by Stanislaus Credit Control Service in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 226462.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Stanislaus Credit Control Service, INC. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
JUD100 JUDGMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Judgment for Stanislaus Credit Control Service, Inc., a California Corporation against Jose M Castro, Amanda Castro in the amount of $728.27. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Disposed.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Default against Jose M Castro, Amanda Castro Entered
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 585 FILED RECORD SEALED Declaration of PLTFS in lieu of personal appearance in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Stanislaus Credit Control Service, Inc. Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION FILED RECORD SEALED Declaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest filed by Stanislaus Credit Control Service, Inc. Declaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.