Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 case against Raymundo, Rolando Q, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Ross, Roger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoss, Roger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2017 |
CategoryLimited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
EJ100 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Midland Funding LLC. Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution issued as to Rolando Q Raymundo on 01/05/2017 to Los Angeles County.
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Payment received by Midland Funding LLC in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 131628.
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
December 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment Issued.
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
December 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Payment received by Hunt & Henriques in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 125952.
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Disposed.
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
JUD100 JUDGMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Judgment for Midland Funding LLC against Rolando Q Raymundo in the amount of $1,414.60. Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
September 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Default against Rolando Q Raymundo Entered
Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
September 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION FILED RECORD SEALED Declaration Pursuant to CCP. 1033 filed by Midland Funding LLC. Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033 Judge: Ross, Roger |
|
September 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
CIV100 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT OR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Midland Funding LLC. Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Judge: Ross, Roger |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.