Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lobel Financial Corp. A California Corporation, filed a(n) Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 case against Barba, Eduardo, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Kronlund, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKronlund, Barbara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2014 |
CategoryLimited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions62 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time1633 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
EJ100 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Lobel Financial Corp. A California Corporation. - FULL Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Judge: Kronlund, Barbara |
|
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Payment received for 141A - Abstract of judgment - Civil, 141I - Writ in the amount of 50.00 on 05/27/2015, transaction number 1506270 and receipt number 399929.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ issued.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Abstract issued.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Automatic Limited Case Disposition Clock expired.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition 18 months met timely.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition 24 months met timely.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Status of Eduardo Barba updated to Disposed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Automatic Judgment After Default Clock stopped.
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.