Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Professional Collection Consultants, filed a(n) Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 case against Hook, Steven, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Coughlan, Michael presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCoughlan, Michael Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2012 |
CategoryLimited Civil Collection Rule 3.740 |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions86 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Case Cycle Time2441 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: Coughlan, Michael |
|
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
EJ100 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED RECORD SEALED Acknowledgment of FULL Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Professional Collection Consultants. Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Judge: Coughlan, Michael |
|
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ issued.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Postjudgment interest accrued 2232.64.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Payment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 08/15/2014, transaction number 1383952 and receipt number 366740.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Costs acknowledged/updated. Judgment total updated to 10606.05.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Professional Collection Consultants on 08/01/2014.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ has been updated.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned filed by Professional Collection Consultants on 07/21/2014.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Payment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 07/25/2013, transaction number 1200562 and receipt number 318030.
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.