Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Progressive Choice Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Meza, Raymond, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Stockton with Humphreys, Elizabeth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHumphreys, Elizabeth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2010 |
CategoryLimited Civil Auto Tort |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStockton |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution issued as to Raymond Meza on 05/11/2018 to Sacramento County.
Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth |
|
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Payment received by Progressive Choice Insurance Company in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 292565.
Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth |
|
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURN FILED RECORD SEALED Writ of Execution returned Unserved as to Raymond Meza. Costs Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution issued as to Raymond Meza on 02/26/2018 to .
Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Payment received by Progressive Choice Insurance Company in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 265201.
Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth |
|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
MC012 MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED RECORD SEALED Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $3,939,84 filed by Progressive Choice Insurance Company. Memorandum of Costs After Judgment. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth |
|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED RECORD SEALED Notice of Change of firm name filed by Progressive Choice Insurance Company. Notice of Change of Address Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth |
|
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Payment received for 94 - Certificate of facts regarding unsatisfied judgment (DL 30), 141J - Certifying a copy, paper or record, 44A - Copy of any record (per side) in the amount of 41.00 on 10/20/2010, transaction number 627157 and receipt number 155897.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice RE: Fee for Clerks Preparation Of Record generated.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Facts RE Unsatisfied judgment issued to PLTF.
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.