Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of San Joaquin, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Williams, Robert, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Family Law Annex with Unassigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUnassigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2010 |
CategoryFamily Support Registration In State Support Order |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseFamily Law Annex |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: Unassigned |
|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Statement for Registration of California Support Order filed by County Of San Joaquin. Statement for Registration of California Support Order Judge: Unassigned |
|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Registration of California Support Order filed by County Of San Joaquin. Statement for Registration of California Support Order Judge: Unassigned |
|
December 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order after hearing
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
MO: Motion hearing held - Modification
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion re child support
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion - Modification
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
August 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOM-Mod Child Support Health Care & Payment on Arrears[PETR] COUNTY OF SAN JOAQUIN;
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
October 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of service by mail for Stip & order filed 10/16/12 to[OPAR] ANDREA TIPPETS; on 10/19/12
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
October 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of service by mail for Stip &order filed 10/16/12 to[RESP] ROBERT WILLIAMS; on 10/19/12
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.