Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of San Joaquin, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Mercado, Adrian R, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Family Law Annex with CONVERSION presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONVERSION Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 16, 2006 |
CategoryFamily Support Registration In State Support Order |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseFamily Law Annex |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice Regarding Payment of Support
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
January 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement for Registration of CA Support Order
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
January 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of registration of California support
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
June 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of service by mail stmt for regis; ntc sub payee;[RESP] ADRIAN R MERCADO; [OPAR] DOLORES T CARRERA; 5/18/06
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of registration of California support
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice Regarding Payment of Support
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Pro per respondent
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Statement for Registration of CA Support Order
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Administrative disposition
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.