Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of San Joaquin, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Lee, Dante, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Family Law Annex with McCann, Cheryl A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcCann, Cheryl A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2019 |
CategoryFamily Support Complaint |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions280 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
|
Filing Court HouseFamily Law Annex |
Case Cycle Time304 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by County of San Joaquin. Notice of Entry of Judgment Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment Regarding Parental Obligations entered and filed.
Judge: McCann, Cheryl A. |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Disposed.
Judge: McCann, Cheryl A. |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Income and Expense Declaration filed by Lee, Dante. Income and Expense Declaration Judge: McCann, Cheryl A. |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: Notice of Motion (Governmental)-Mod held on July 15, 2020.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minutes finalized for Notice of Motion (Governmental)-Mod held on 07/15/2020 09:30 AM .
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minutes finalized for Notice of Motion (Governmental)-Mod held on 06/04/2020 09:30 AM .
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Notice of Motion (Governmental)-Mod LCSA NOM Judgment, Child support and Health Care **in person **Mo ok by phone if working, set for 07/15/2020 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Cheryl A. McCann in Department 5A.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing re: Notice of Motion (Governmental)-Mod held on June 4, 2020.
Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin |
|
April 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Golden Rod
Judge: McCann, Cheryl A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.