Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of San Joaquin, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Booth, Michelle, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Family Law Annex with CONVERSION presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONVERSION Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 01, 2012 |
CategoryFamily Support Complaint |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseFamily Law Annex |
Case Cycle Time2428 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
October 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of service by mail for Stip for jgmnt or supplemental jgmnt regarding parental obligations and jgmnt filed on 10/18/12 to[DEFT] MICHELLE BOOTH; on 10/23/12
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
October 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of service by mail for Stip for jgmnt or supplemental jgmnt regarding parental obligations and jgmnt filed 10/18/12 to[OPAR] DANA DOERR; on 10/23/12
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
October 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Judgment or Supplemental Judgment regarding parental obligations and judgment
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
October 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
October 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Initial petition/complaint filed
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.