Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of San Joaquin, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Boolin, Rebecca J, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Family Law Annex with CONVERSION presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONVERSION Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2009 |
CategoryFamily Support Complaint |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseFamily Law Annex |
Case Cycle Time3540 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of entry of judgment for hearingless default on 2/17/11 to[DEFT] REBECCA J BOOLIN; [OPAR] David A Ramirez;
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearingless default order
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request to enter default against[DEFT] REBECCA J BOOLIN;
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration for default/uncontested judgment
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amended complaint filed
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Initial petition/complaint filed
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.