Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of San Joaquin, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Ortiz, Elias S., in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Family Law Annex with McCann, Cheryl presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcCann, Cheryl Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2008 |
CategoryFamily Support Complaint |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseFamily Law Annex |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Notice of Motion (Governmental)-Mod LCSA NOM MOD, Child Support, Health Care, Payment on Arrears, set for 10/26/2021 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Cheryl A. McCann in Department 5A.
Judge: McCann, Cheryl A. |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion(Governmental) Mod filed by County Of San Joaquin. Notice of Motion(Governmental) Mod Judge: McCann, Cheryl A. |
|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: Unassigned, |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute Order of hearing calendared for December 30, 2014
Judge: CONVERSION, |
|
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion - Modification
Judge: CONVERSION, |
|
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion re child support
Judge: CONVERSION, |
|
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
LCSA - NOM Mod Child support Health care and Payment on arrears
Judge: CONVERSION, |
|
May 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order re:contempt
Judge: CONVERSION, |
|
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
MO: OSC hearing held - Enforcement
Judge: CONVERSION, |
|
April 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Post sentencing/ Compliance Review
Judge: CONVERSION, |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.