Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Corren, Nikolas P, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Corren, Crystal Marie, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Family Law Annex with Appel, Robin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAppel, Robin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2018 |
CategoryDissolution With Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseFamily Law Annex |
Case Cycle Time171 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: Appel, Robin |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing Result: Dropped
Judge: Appel, Robin |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal filed by Corren, Nikolas P. Request for Dismissal Judge: Appel, Robin |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Disposed.
Judge: Appel, Robin |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Nikolas P Corren, Crystal Marie Corren Entered.
Judge: Appel, Robin |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Request for Order, Temporary Emergency Orders, Petition & Summons as to Crystal Marie Corren served on 12/19/2018 by Personal Service. .
Judge: Appel, Robin |
|
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Temporary Emergency (Ex Parte) Orders as to Nikolas P Corren Granted and filed.
Judge: Appel, Robin |
|
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Request for Order-Initial Petr's RFO Child Custody, Visitation, Property Control, Resp not to change minor's school and residence pending the hearing date, Temp Orders, set for 01/17/2019 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Robin Appel in Department 4A.
Judge: Appel, Robin |
|
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Notice of Ex Parte Application filed by Corren, Nikolas P. Declaration re: Notice of Ex Parte Application Judge: Appel, Robin |
|
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Order with Temporary Orders and/or Order Shortening Time Granted and filed on 12/10/2018.
Judge: Appel, Robin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.