Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Caldwell, James R, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Caldwell, Shannon Aimie, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Family Law Annex with Unassigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUnassigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2012 |
CategoryDissolution With Children |
Time To Trial607 days |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Filing Court HouseFamily Law Annex |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: Unassigned |
|
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Payment received in the amount of $15.00, receipt number 117065.
Judge: Unassigned |
|
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute Order of hearing calendared for August 11, 2014
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
June 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute Order of hearing calendared for June 30, 2014
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESP (Shannon Aimie Caldwell ) changed to pro per;
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of withdrawal of attorney of record[RESP] Shannon Aimie Caldwell;
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment filed, marital status terminated on 6/6/14
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Entry of judgment before hearing
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration for default/uncontested judgment
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Waiver of Final Disclosure Declaration
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.