Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Becerra, Evangelina, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Becerra, James Joseph, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Family Law Annex with Unassigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUnassigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2012 |
CategoryDomestic Violence With Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseFamily Law Annex |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
MO: OSC hearing held
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of service by mail - response to request for r/o,mailed to[PETR] Evangelina Becerra; mailed on 02-24-12
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for DV R/O
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Emergency Protective Order filed by[PETR] Evangelina Becerra;
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of OSC/TRO served by Sheriff's Office[RESP] James Joseph Becerra; served 2/3/12
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
OSC / TRO (Evangelina Becerra)
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration re notice of ex-parte application
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for order
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.