Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Velazquez, Rosa, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Dollard, Jennifer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDollard, Jennifer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryOther Probate Petition |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Other Proof of deposit of funds in blocked account.. (No appearance required if proof (MC-356) has been filed prior to the hearing Judge: Ornell, Lawrence E |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Receipt & Ack of Order for Deposit of Money in Blocked Acct | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Account Filed | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Approving Compromise of Claim Filed | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Compromise of Minor's Claim
Judge: Chouteau, Rene A |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition to Approve Compromise of Claim 10/12/21 @ 4:00 pm D18 |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing
Judge: Dollard, Jennifer V |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition - Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.